IL SB0676 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0165
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0165
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State may issue such additional temporary driver's licenses to an applicant as are necessary to allow the applicant to drive during the pendency of an investigation and determination of all facts relative to such applicant's eligibility for such a license, valid for such a period as is appropriate, but in no event for longer than 90 days each. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH-CD-TEMP DRIVER'S LICENSES
Sponsors
Sen. Ram Villivalam [D] | Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Aaron Ortiz [D] |
Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Rep. Jawaharial Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0165 |
2021-07-26 | Senate | Effective Date July 26, 2021 |
2021-07-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2021-05-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-05-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-004-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 018-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 6-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |