IL SB0674 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Identification Card Act. Provides that the Secretary of State shall refuse to issue a REAL ID compliant identification card to any person who has been issued a REAL ID compliant driver's license under the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that any person may surrender a REAL ID compliant driver's license in order to become eligible to obtain a REAL ID compliant identification card. Provides that the Secretary may issue both REAL ID compliant identification cards and non-compliant identification cards, and may permit applicants to designate which type of identification card they wish to receive. Provides that all provisions applicable to non-compliant identification cards shall also apply to REAL ID compliant identification cards, except where the provisions are inconsistent with the REAL ID Act and implementing regulations. Requires the Secretary to establish by rule the date on which issuance of REAL ID compliant identification cards will begin. Provides for the issuance of confidential identification cards as either REAL ID compliant identification cards or non-compliant identification cards. Provides that every identification card or Illinois Person with a Disability Identification Card issued to an applicant who is not a United States citizen or permanent resident shall be marked "Limited Term" and shall expire, if the earliest among other potential expiration dates, one year from the date of issuance of a Limited Term REAL ID compliant identification card. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code to make similar changes concerning issuance of driver's licenses. Defines terms. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
REAL ID COMPLIANT CARDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 017-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 28, 2017 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 15, 2017 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 013-000-000 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 335 | 1A | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 335 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 335 | 4D | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 335 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 335 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-100.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 6-103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |