IL SB0671 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-08 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Utilities Act. Makes a technical change in the short title Section.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EPA-CCR SURFACE IMPOUNDMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 12 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2020-01-08HouseFirst Reading
2019-11-14HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-11-14HouseArrived in House
2019-11-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-11-14SenateThird Reading - Passed; 039-012-001
2019-11-14Senate3/5 Vote Required
2019-11-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-11-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Bennett
2019-11-14SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-11-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-002-000
2019-11-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2019-11-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2019-11-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-11-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-11-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-11-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-11-12SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-10-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 29, 2019
2019-10-28SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2019-10-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As November 14, 2019
2019-04-12SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
2019-03-07SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2019-02-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22051-101Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback