IL SB0668 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the COVID-19 Federal Emergency Rental Assistance Program Act. Contains provisions for: the Federal Emergency Rental Assistance program; accessibility and transparency; process for further prioritizing applicants for financial assistance and housing stability services; and required notifications and correspondence. Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Makes changes concerning the sealing of court files. Provides that certain new provisions concerning sealing of court files in a residential eviction action apply until August 1, 2022. Contains provisions for: the sealing of a court file in a residential eviction action; emergency sealing of a court file in a residential eviction action during the COVID-19 emergency and economic recovery period; and a temporary COVID-19 stay of certain foreclosure proceedings and filings. Makes corresponding changes to a provision regarding demand for rent and eviction actions. Makes corresponding changes in the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Effective immediately.
Title
COVID19-EMERG HOUSING ASSIST
Sponsors
Sen. Omar Aquino [D] | Sen. Robert Peters [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Cristina Pacione-Zayas [D] |
Sen. Adriane Johnson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 15-1513 | New Code | See Bill Text |
735 | 5 | 15-1514 | New Code | See Bill Text |
735 | 5 | 9-121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 9-121.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
735 | 5 | 9-122 | New Code | See Bill Text |
815 | 505 | 2Z.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=668&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0668.htm |