IL SB0668 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Navigator Certification Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
REGULATION-TECH
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Steven Landek [D] |
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-12-15 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 013-004-000 |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 29, 2019 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As November 14, 2019 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 121 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |