IL SB0663 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-04 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-04 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Creates a uniform statement of economic interest form that must be completed by all persons who are required to file that form under the Act. Changes the nature of the required disclosures that must be made. Requires the Secretary of State to adjust specified amounts that prompt disclosure under the Act for purposes of inflation, and requires the Secretary to make conforming changes to the statement of economic interest form. Requires candidates filing for supreme court justice, appellate court judge, circuit court judge, or judicial retention to file his or her statement of economic interests in written or printed form. Modifies requirements concerning legislator restricted activities and code of conduct. Prohibits a person appointed to an affected office from serving as an officer of a candidate political committee under specified circumstances. Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Further restricts fundraising in Sangamon County during sessions of the General Assembly. Modifies provisions concerning procurement and revolving door prohibitions concerning the fiscal administration of State contracts. Modifies requirements concerning the Legislative Inspector General. Amends the Election Code. Prohibits a member of the State Board of Elections from contributing to a political committee, serving as an officer of a political committee, or being a candidate supported by a candidate political committee. Prohibits a limited activity committee from accepting contributions except under specified circumstances. Provides that a limited activity committee may only make specified expenditures. Amends the General Assembly Compensation Act. Provides that the compensation to be paid per year to members of the General Assembly shall be paid bi-monthly. Provides for member compensation on a prorated basis. Amends the Lobbyist Registration Act. Applies the requirements of the Act to municipalities, counties, and officials thereof, and other specified State officials. Defines terms. Makes conforming changes. Adds an applicability clause. Effective January 1, 2022.
Title
GOVT ETHICS-ECONOMIC INTERESTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Ethics |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 1A-14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 9-1.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 9-3.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9-8.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | 115 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | 170 | 11.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | 170 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | 170 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | 170 | 4.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | 170 | 4.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | 170 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | 170 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | 170 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 420 | 1-102.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-104.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-104.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-104.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-105.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-105.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-105.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-105.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-105.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-109 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 420 | 1-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 420 | 1-112.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-113.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 1-113.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 2-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 420 | 3A-50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 420 | 4A-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 420 | 4A-103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 420 | 4A-104 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 420 | 4A-107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 420 | 4A-108 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 25-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 5-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 5-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=663&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0663.htm |