IL SB0662 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Pension Buyout Act. Authorizes the Department of Central Management Services to enter into contracts with approved vendors to provide pension buyout payments to eligible retirees in the General Assembly, State Employee, State Universities, and Judges Retirement Systems. Requires the Illinois Finance Authority to issue bonds if the amount appropriated to implement the pension buyout option is less than the amount necessary for the Department to pay the approved vendor the amount required under a contract between the Department and the approved vendor for any fiscal year. Provides that the contract entered into by the Department shall be subject to the applicable requirements of the Illinois Procurement Code. Amends the General Assembly, State Employee, State Universities, and Judges Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that an eligible retiree may relinquish his or her right to receive any benefits from the system in exchange for a lump sum payment made by an approved vendor that is equal to the present value of the retirement annuity. Provides that a person who participates in the pension buyout option shall be entitled to any benefits under the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971 that he or she would have otherwise been entitled to. Contains provisions concerning the form of the contract; rulemaking; notice to the System; certification to the Department of the amount of lump sum payments made; and qualified plan status. Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971, the Department of Central Management Services Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois, the Illinois Procurement Code, and the Illinois Finance Authority Act to make related changes. Effective July 1, 2018.
Title
PEN CD-PENSION BUYOUT OPTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Pensions |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3501 | 801-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 405 | 405-298 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 500 | 45-32 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 14-147 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 14-147.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 15-185 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 15-185.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 16-190 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 16-190.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 18-161 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 18-161.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 2-154 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 2-154.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 375 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=662&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0662.htm |