IL SB0661 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Reinserts the contents of the bill with the following changes. Adds provisions concerning the priority in the award of scholarships for a fiscal year in which the amount of an appropriation is insufficient to provide scholarships to all qualified candidates. Makes changes concerning priority consideration to those applicants who are members of a racial minority. Removes a reference to "private or parochial school". Requires the repayment of amounts received if a recipient fails to fulfill the work obligation required under the terms of the scholarship, with exceptions. Effective January 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIGHER ED-SOCIAL WORK/EDUCATOR

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 51 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 051-006-000
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Higher Education; 011-002-000
2021-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Higher Education
2021-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Ann Gillespie
2021-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 28, 2021
2021-05-27SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2021-05-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-044-001
2021-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2021-05-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 006-004-000
2021-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
2021-05-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2021-05-13HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-05-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2021-05-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 006-004-000
2021-05-12HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2021-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2021-05-06HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-05-06HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2021-05-06HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2021-05-04HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2021-04-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-29HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2021-04-28HouseArrived in House
2021-04-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2021-04-28SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-001-000
2021-04-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Gillespie
2021-04-28SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2021-04-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 013-000-000
2021-04-23SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021
2021-04-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2021-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021
2021-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
2021-04-14SenateDo Pass Higher Education; 011-000-000
2021-03-24SenatePostponed - Higher Education
2021-03-16SenatePostponed - Higher Education
2021-03-09SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2021-02-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-24SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11094765.110New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=661&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0661.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0661eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0661enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0661sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0661ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0661ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB0661_04282021_001000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200SB0661_05272021_016000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB0661ham002_05302021_053000C.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback