IL SB0660 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Workers' Compensation Act in relation to repetitive injuries. Provides that an accidental injury that results from repetitive or cumulative trauma and occurs within 6 months after the employee begins employment shall not be considered by a workers' compensation insurer in setting premium rates. Provides for contribution by prior employers with respect to awards for repetitive or cumulative injuries. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act to authorize emergency rulemaking.
Title
WORKERS COMP-REPETITIVE INJURY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Re-assigned to Judiciary |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 100 | 5-45.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 305 | 8.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=660&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0660.htm |