IL SB0660 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Veterans' Health Insurance Program Act of 2008. Changes the short title of the Act to the Veterans' Supplemental Health Insurance Program Act of 2008. Makes conforming changes in the Illinois Public Aid Code and State Finance Act. Changes references in the Act from "Veterans' Health Insurance Program" to "Veterans' Supplemental Health Insurance Program". Provides that enrollment in the Program is limited to individuals at or below 200% of the federal poverty level (currently, enrollment is based on the availability of funds and may be capped based on the availability of funds appropriated for the Program). Makes conforming changes in eligibility provisions concerning household income requirements. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall adopt rules concerning covered services that must include dental preventative and restorative services. Removes a provision providing that the spouse of a veteran is ineligible for coverage under the Program for a minimum period of 3 months if the required monthly premium is not paid. Removes a provision stating that the Program is not an entitlement. Makes changes to provisions concerning legislative intent.
Title
VETERANS-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Human Services; 008-000-000 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 6z-52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 11-22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 11-22a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 11-22b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 11-22c | Amended Code | Citation Text |
330 | 126 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
330 | 126 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
330 | 126 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
330 | 126 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
330 | 126 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |