IL SB0658 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0313
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Foreign Banking Office Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROF LAND SURVEYOR-SUNSET

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0313
2019-08-09SenateEffective Date August 9, 2019
2019-08-09SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
2019-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 005-000-000
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 005-000-000
2019-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 005-000-000
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities
2019-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-05-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 - May 29, 2019
2019-05-28SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3
2019-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2019-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2019-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-05-28HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 026-000-000
2019-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 026-000-000
2019-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2019-05-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-08HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 024-000-000
2019-05-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-05-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-05-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-04-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-12HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-12HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-04-12HouseArrived in House
2019-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-04-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; T. Cullerton
2019-04-11SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 005-000-000
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-04-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
2019-04-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-03-19SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
2019-03-07SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2019-02-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2056451Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=658&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0658.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0658eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0658enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0313.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0658sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0658sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0658ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0658ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0658ham003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0658_04112019_060000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB0658_05282019_005000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0658ham003_05302019_032002C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0658ham002_05302019_032001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0658ham001_05302019_032000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback