IL SB0657 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Boxing and Full-contact Martial Arts Act. Changes the definition of "amateur" to allow the person to receive a stipend for an athletic club or sponsor of the contestant to cover the cost of training and participation expenses not to exceed $1,500. Provides that "full-contact martial arts" includes, but is not limited to, mixed martial arts and kickboxing techniques. Defines "incumbent sanctioning body". Allows amateur boxing or full-contact martial arts contests sponsored by a State, county, or municipal entity to be conducted by a sanctioning body approved by the Act without oversight by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation. Provides that specified qualified entities are exempt from oversight by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation and must notify the Department of their intent to sponsor events covered under the Act. Adds provisions for sanctioning bodies. Effective immediately.
Title
BOXING/MARTIAL ARTS
Sponsors
Sen. Kyle McCarter [R] | Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] | Sen. David Koehler [D] | Sen. Neil Anderson [R] |
Sen. Dan McConchie [R] | Sen. Chuck Weaver [R] | Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2017-02-09 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (LA) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 105 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 105 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 105 | 8.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=657&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0657.htm |