IL SB0656 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0311
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0311
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act by extending the repeal date of the Perfusionist Practice Act to January 1, 2030. Amends the Perfusionist Practice Act. Provides that all applicants and licensees shall provide an email address of record to the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation. Provides that a nonresident applicant for endorsement by the Department has 3 years to complete the application process. Provides that the Department may contract for court reporting services for any formal hearing in which a license may be revoked, suspended, placed on probationary status, reprimanded, fined, or otherwise subjected to disciplinary action. Provides that if a hearing officer is appointed to conduct a formal hearing, that officer shall report his or her findings of fact, conclusions of law, and recommendations to the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation and the Board of Licensing for Perfusionists (rather than to the Board). Provides that no person whose license has been revoked may apply for restoration until an application is permitted under the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that a license that has been suspended or revoked shall be considered nonrenewed for the purposes of restoration. Makes changes concerning the powers and duties of the Department; the Board; application for licensure; licensure by endorsement; renewal, reinstatement, or restoration of licenses by persons in military service; continuing education; inactive status; fees; grounds for disciplinary action; record of proceedings; hearings; hearing officers; restoration for disciplinary status; administrative review; and unlicensed practice. Repeals provisions requiring the Department to maintain a roster and provisions imposing criminal penalties for violations of the grounds for disciplinary action. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PERFUSIONIST PRACTICE-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Sen. Omar Aquino [D] | Rep. Theresa Mah [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0311 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Aquino |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 005-000-000 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 625 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |