IL SB0656 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Confidentiality Act. Provides that records and communications may be disclosed without consent by any treatment provider to a public defender or other attorney appointed by the court or retained by a criminal defendant for the purpose of preparing for and conducting a hearing to determine whether to release the defendant on her or his own recognizance or to determine the amount of bail or the conditions of the bail bond. Provides that the records and communications may be used only for the purpose of the hearing and shall not be further disclosed without the consent of the defendant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MENTAL HEALTH RECORD-BAIL BOND

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2017-03-15SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-02-16SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-01-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-25SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-25SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7401109.12New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback