IL SB0654 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0357
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0357
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the contents of the engrossed bill, and makes the following changes. Provides that play time shall be for all students in kindergarten through grade 5 (rather than for all students in kindergarten through grade 8). Requires play time to be for at least 30 minutes (rather than 60 minutes) on any school day that is 5 clock hours or longer in length. Provides that, for any school day less than 5 clock hours, play time shall be at least one-tenth (rather than one-fifth) of a day of attendance. Removes the requirement that, to the extent appropriate, students with disabilities shall participate in play with students who do not have a disability; provides instead that play time must comply with a student's applicable individualized education program (IEP) or federal Section 504 plan. Effective July 1, 2021.
Title
SCH CD-STUDENT PLAY TIME
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 38 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 60 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 60 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0357 |
2021-08-13 | Senate | Effective Date August 13, 2021 |
2021-08-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 038-018-000 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Education; 009-004-000 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Education |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2021 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 060-052-000 |
2021-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-05-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-05-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2021-05-20 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Dave Vella |
2021-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2021-05-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 014-009-000 |
2021-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2021-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2021-05-14 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Avery Bourne |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-05-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 014-009-000 |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2021-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2021-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 036-016-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 010-004-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Re-assigned to Education |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |