IL SB0650 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0782
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0782
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that certain notices concerning requests for mandate waivers may be made electronically.
Title
SCH CD-MANDATE WAIVER NOTICE
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Connelly [R] | Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] | Sen. William Cunningham [D] | Sen. Chuck Weaver [R] |
Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant [D] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0782 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 13, 2018 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Re-assigned to Education |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Re-assigned to Education |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.25g | Amended Code | Citation Text |