IL SB0648 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-21 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Utilities Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning recovery of costs associated with the provision of delivery services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ANIMAL WELFARE-RELEASE-SHELTER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-21HouseTabled
2014-05-21HouseMotion Prevailed
2014-05-16HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 23, 2014
2014-05-15HouseMotion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Wayne Rosenthal
2014-05-13HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2014-05-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2014-05-13HouseFirst Reading
2014-05-13HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Wayne Rosenthal
2014-05-01HouseArrived in House
2014-05-01SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2014-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2014-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Manar
2014-05-01SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2014-04-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Agriculture and Conservation; 007-000-000
2014-04-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture and Conservation
2014-04-11SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 1, 2014
2014-04-11SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andy Manar
2014-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2014-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2014-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 7, 2014
2014-04-03SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2013-04-16SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2013-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2013
2013-04-12SenateSecond Reading
2013-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013
2013-03-20SenateDo Pass Executive; 010-000-000
2013-03-13SenateAssigned to Executive
2013-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2013-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2013-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
220516-108Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback