IL SB0647 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-21 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-21 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Makes changes to the provisions of the Code relating to policies addressing sexual abuse. In the Courses of Study Article, repeals the sex education, family life, and instruction on diseases provisions. Instead, creates an age-appropriate comprehensive sex education program that shall be taught to students enrolled in kindergarten through 12th grade. Provides that the sex education curricula shall, among other provisions, provide information regarding sexual health, consent, personal safety, pregnancy, and sexually transmitted diseases. Provides that the instruction, among other provisions, shall incorporate discussion about diversity in cultures, families, gender identity, economic status, and the roles that these factors play in the development of sexual health and human relationships. Contains provisions that allow a parent or guardian to excuse his or her child from receiving the instruction. Provides for the formation of a committee to assist in the implementation of these provisions. Makes changes in the Chicago School District Article concerning AIDS training. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-HEALTH ED/SEX ABUSE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-23.13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27-11 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27-9.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27-9.1a | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 27-9.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27A-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |