IL SB0646 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0406
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DOMESTIC VIOLENCE CO-LOCATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-25SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0406
2017-08-25SenateEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-25SenateGovernor Approved
2017-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. David Koehler
2017-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. David Koehler
2017-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3 - May 31, 2017
2017-05-31SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3
2017-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-05-31HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
2017-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2017-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed to Table Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-05-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-05-03HouseArrived in House
2017-05-02SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Koehler
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 006-000-000
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2017-03-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-01-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-25SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-25SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32551Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=646&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0646.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0646eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0646enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0406.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0646sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0646ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0646ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0646ham003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0646_05022017_013000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB0646_05312017_012000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0646_05312017_126001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0646_05312017_126000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback