IL SB0643 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that the head and employees of a State agency affected by or involved in an investigation shall keep confidential and shall not disclose information exempted from disclosure under the Act or the Freedom of Information Act. Permits disclosure of investigatory files, reports, and requests for information of or by the Office of an Executive Inspector General to the head of a State agency affected by or involved in an investigation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ETHICS DISCLOSURES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-05-29HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-29HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-26HouseArrived in House
2017-05-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2017
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Steans
2017-05-25SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 017-000-000
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
2017-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateDo Pass as Amended Executive; 016-000-000
2017-05-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2017-05-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-05-05SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-05SenateRe-referred to Executive
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-02-09SenateTo Subcommittee on Governmental Operations
2017-02-01SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-25SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-25SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
543020-90Amended CodeCitation Text
543020-95Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback