IL SB0642 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nurse Practice Act. In provisions concerning scope of practice, written collaborative agreements, temporary practice with a collaborative agreement, prescriptive authority with a collaborative agreement, titles, advertising, continuing education, and reports relating to professional conduct and capacity, changes references of "advanced practice nurse" and "APN" to "advanced practice registered nurse" and "APRN". Provides that a written collaborative agreement is required for all postgraduate advanced practice registered nurses until specific requirements have been met. Provides that postgraduate advanced practice registered nurses may enter into written collaborative agreements with collaborating advanced practice registered nurses or physicians (rather than collaborating physicians or podiatric physicians). In provisions concerning prescriptive authority for postgraduate advanced practice registered nurses, sets forth the requirements for postgraduate advanced practice registered nurses to have prescriptive authority and the limitations of such authority. Defines "full practice authority" and provides requirements for it to be granted to an advanced practice registered nurse. Removes provisions concerning advanced practice nursing in hospitals, hospital affiliates, or ambulatory surgical treatment centers, except the provision for anesthesia services and the provision requiring advanced practice registered nurses to provide services in accordance with other Acts. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
NURSES-APRN SCOPE OF PRACTICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 008-004-000 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2017 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-001-001 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 65 | 15-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 15-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 15-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 15-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 15-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 15-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 15-55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 65-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 65-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 65-35.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 65-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 65-43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 65 | 65-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 65-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 65-55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 65-60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 65-65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |