IL SB0641 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0405
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0405
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Animal Control Act. Provides that if the money from registration fees is placed in the county animal population control fund it may also be used for a purpose under the Food Stamp Program or the Social Security Disability Insurance Benefits Program for an animal control facility, animal shelter, organization or resident (currently, resident) who humanely traps feral cats for spaying or neutering and return under a provision in the Illinois Public Health and Safety Animal Population Control Act. Provides that only the registration requirements, the registration fees, the microchipping requirements, and the microchipping fees under the Act do not apply to feral cats, rather than the entire Section shall not apply to feral cats. Provides that if no placement is available by an animal control facility, the dog or cat may (rather than shall) be humanely dispatched under the Humane Euthanasia in Animal Shelters Act. Amends the Illinois Public Health and Safety Animal Population Control Act. Provides that a resident of State who owns a dog or cat and who is eligible for any government assistance, including the Food Stamp Program or the Social Security Disability Insurance Benefits Program (rather than solely a resident eligible for the Food Stamp Program or the Social Security Disability Insurance Benefits Program), shall be eligible to participate in the program at a reduced rate if the owner signs a consent form certifying that he or she is the owner of the dog or cat or is authorized to present the dog or cat for the procedure. Provides that an animal control facility, animal shelter, organization, or a resident of this State who humanely traps feral cats for spaying or neutering and return is eligible to participate in the program if recognized by the municipality or by the county. Effective immediately.
Title
ANIMAL CONTROL-FERAL CATS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 37 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0405 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-037-001 |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-08 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-003-000 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Agriculture; 010-001-000 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Agriculture |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Agriculture |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
510 | 5 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
510 | 5 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
510 | 92 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |