IL SB0636 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Pharmacy Practice Act. Provides that the Act shall not apply to, or in any manner interfere with, the sale or distribution of dialysate, drugs, or devices necessary to perform home renal dialysis for patients with chronic kidney failure, provided that certain conditions are met. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PHARMACY-DIALYSIS DRUGS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-05-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 015-000-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-05-03HouseArrived in House
2017-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-03SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2017
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Link
2017-04-25SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000
2017-03-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017
2017-03-01SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2017-02-16SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-01SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-01-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-25SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-25SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
225854Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback