IL SB0634 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. Provides that the failure of the State of Illinois to adequately reimburse a dental provider for a period of 6 months from the date a claim was submitted may be considered by the provider to be a material breach of any associated participating provider contract utilized by the State for its employees. Provides that a dental provider who has an existing contract that provides services to State employees under this Act and who has not received timely reimbursement for services for a period of 6 months: (1) may consider the associated provider contract null and void for the State of Illinois; (2) may opt out of the obligation to provide services under the terms and conditions of the associated provider contract without penalty by the State or the administrator of the dental plan including any provision that allows for termination from any other commercial plans administered by the dental insurer without cause; and (3) shall, upon providing notice, be deemed an out-of-network provider from that time forward. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE EMPLOYEE GRP INS-PAYMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-06HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-000-000
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-05-16HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-05-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2017-05-11HouseArrived in House
2017-05-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-05-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Bennett
2017-05-11SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 010-000-000
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2017-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-03-07SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Andy Manar
2017-03-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-03-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017
2017-03-01SenateDo Pass Insurance; 010-001-004
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2017-02-01SenateAssigned to Insurance
2017-01-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-01-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-25SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-25SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
53756.12aNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback