IL SB0625 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal of the Nurse Practice Act from January 1, 2018 to January 1, 2028. Amends the Nurse Practice Act. Defines "focused assessment", "full practice authority", "oversight", and "postgraduate advanced practice nurse". Changes references of "advanced practice nurse" and "APN" to "advanced practice registered nurse" and "APRN" throughout the Act. Replaces provisions regarding nursing delegation with provisions that prohibit specified actions. Provides other guidelines for delegation of nursing activities and medication administration. Makes changes to education program requirements, qualifications for licensure, the scope of practice, and continuing education for LPN and RN licensees. Provides that a written collaborative agreement is required for all postgraduate advanced practice registered nurses until specific requirements have been met. Provides that postgraduate advanced practice registered nurses may enter into written collaborative agreements with collaborating advanced practice registered nurses or physicians (rather than collaborating physicians or podiatric physicians). In provisions concerning prescriptive authority for postgraduate advanced practice registered nurses, sets forth the requirements for postgraduate advanced practice registered nurses to have prescriptive authority and the limitations of such authority. Makes changes to provisions concerning the grounds for disciplinary action under the Act. Requires the Department of Public Health to prepare a report regarding the moneys appropriated from the Nursing Dedicated and Professional Fund to the Department of Public Health for nursing scholarships. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NURSE PRACTICE ACT-VARIOUS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2017
2017-03-09SenateDo Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-03-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-16SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-09SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-01SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-01-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-25SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-25SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2256510-30Amended CodeCitation Text
2256510-35Amended CodeCitation Text
2256510-37Amended CodeCitation Text
2256510-45Amended CodeCitation Text
2256515-15Amended CodeCitation Text
2256515-20Amended CodeCitation Text
2256515-25Amended CodeCitation Text
2256515-30Amended CodeCitation Text
2256515-40Amended CodeCitation Text
2256515-45Amended CodeCitation Text
2256515-55Amended CodeCitation Text
2256520-40Amended CodeCitation Text
225655-10Amended CodeCitation Text
2256550-10Amended CodeCitation Text
2256550-70Amended CodeCitation Text
2256550-75Amended CodeCitation Text
2256555-10Amended CodeCitation Text
2256555-30Amended CodeCitation Text
2256555-35Amended CodeCitation Text
2256555-5Amended CodeCitation Text
2256560-10Amended CodeCitation Text
2256560-15Amended CodeCitation Text
2256560-35Amended CodeCitation Text
2256560-5Amended CodeCitation Text
2256565-30Amended CodeCitation Text
2256565-35Amended CodeCitation Text
2256565-35.1Amended CodeCitation Text
2256565-35.2New CodeSee Bill Text
2256565-40Amended CodeCitation Text
2256565-43New CodeSee Bill Text
2256565-45Amended CodeCitation Text
2256565-50Amended CodeCitation Text
2256565-55Amended CodeCitation Text
2256565-60Amended CodeCitation Text
2256565-65Amended CodeCitation Text
2256570-5Amended CodeCitation Text
2256570-50Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.28Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.38New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback