IL SB0624 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Out-of-State Person Subject to Involuntary Admission on an Inpatient Basis Mental Health Treatment Act. Provides that on or before January 1, 2018, there is created a 2-year mental health pilot program for which a mental health facility located in Rock Island County, Illinois may accept the admission of an Iowa resident from the Eastern Iowa Mental Health Region who is a person subject to involuntary admission on an inpatient basis under an order issued by an Iowa court for treatment at a mental health facility in this State for which the Iowa court shall have jurisdiction over the recipient while committed to a mental health facility in this State. Provides that the pilot program shall also provide that a resident of Rock Island County, Illinois who is a person subject to involuntary admission on an inpatient basis under an order issued by a court of this State for treatment at a mental health facility in this State may receive inpatient treatment in an Iowa mental health facility. Provides that the Iowa or Illinois mental health facility shall provide mental health services to the recipient for the duration of the court order and shall return the recipient to his or her state of legal residence upon discharge. In the event a recipient has to enter a State-operated facility, the recipient must be returned to his or her state of legal residence. Defines "Eastern Iowa Mental Health Region", "person subject to involuntary admission on an inpatient basis", "mental health facility", "Pilot Project Area", "receiving agency", "receiving state", and "sending state". Provide that the Act is repealed on January 1, 2020. Effective July 1, 2017.
Title
IOWA MH-INVOLUNTARY ADMISSION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Anderson |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 010-000-000 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |