IL SB0620 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Video Gaming Act. In the definition of "terminal operator", adds to mean the individual, partnership, corporation, or limited liability company is engaged in the occupation of owning, placing, operating, and maintaining video gaming terminals. Provides that a video gaming terminal is not an amusement for purposes of the Illinois Municipal Code and is a gambling device as defined under federal law. Adds that the act of owning, placing, operating, and maintaining video gaming terminals by terminal operators is an occupation upon which home rule municipalities are prohibited from imposing taxes under the Illinois Constitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VIDEO GAMING-LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-03-10SenateTo Executive- Gaming
2021-03-03SenateAssigned to Executive
2021-02-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-24SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
230405Amended CodeCitation Text
2304060Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback