IL SB0612 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Compensation Review Act. Provides that members of the General Assembly are prohibited from receiving and shall not receive any increase in compensation that would otherwise apply based on a cost of living adjustment for terms commencing on or after January 1, 2023, unless otherwise approved by law. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GA-COLA PROHIBITED

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2022-01-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2021-04-16SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-04-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
2021-03-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2021-03-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
2021-03-24SenateTo Executive- Government Operations
2021-03-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller
2021-03-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2021-03-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey
2021-03-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart
2021-03-23SenateAssigned to Executive
2021-02-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-24SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Craig Wilcox

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
251207New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback