IL SB0604 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that taxpayers (other than estates, trusts, partnerships, Subchapter S corporations, and farmers) are required to pay estimated tax if the amount payable can reasonably be expected to be more than $1,000 (currently, $500). Provides that corporations are required to pay estimated tax if the amount payable can reasonably be expected to be more than $400 (which is the same as current law).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TX-ESTIMATED TAX

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2017-03-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2017-02-22SenateTo Subcommittee on Income Taxes
2017-02-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-02-01SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355803Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback