IL SB0597 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-22 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amends "An Act concerning appropriations", Public Act 99-524, approved June 30, 2016. In provisions concerning amounts appropriated for fiscal year 2017 to the Illinois Racing Board payable from the Horse Racing Fund, provides that an amount appropriated is for expenses related to the regulation and promotion (rather than the regulation) of a racing program. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$RACING BOARD-RACING PROGRAM

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-22SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to Appropriations I
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback