IL SB0592 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Renters' Right to Recycle Act. Requires owners of multifamily dwellings to arrange for recycling services that are appropriate to the multifamily dwelling, including, but not limited to, the provision of on-site paper, plastic, and aluminum recycling containers for tenants. Provides exceptions for multifamily dwellings with inadequate space for recycling containers, that do not have a solid waste enterprise providing recycling services that serve the location, or for which the cost of recycling services creates a financial hardship for the building owner. Directs the Environmental Protection Agency to implement, administer, and enforce the Act and adopt necessary rules. Allows residents of multifamily dwellings to file claims with the Agency stating that the owner of the unit in which the resident resides is in violation of the Act. Provides that violators of the Act's provisions may be assessed a civil penalty in an amount to be determined by the Agency. Provides that the Act does not interfere with or prevent a unit of local government from requiring recycling services for multifamily dwellings. Effective July 1, 2022.
Title
RENTERS' RIGHT TO RECYCLE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=592&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0592.htm |