IL SB0592 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Methamphetamine Control and Community Protection Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIMINAL LAW-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2017-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7206461Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback