IL SB0589 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Budget Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that beginning with the budget prepared for fiscal year 2022, the rate of growth of general funds appropriations shall not exceed the rate of growth of the Illinois median household income. Defines "rate of growth of the Illinois median household income". Effective immediately.
Title
STATE BUDGET-RATE OF GROWTH
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Glowiak Hilton [D] | Sen. John Curran [R] | Sen. Steven Landek [D] | Sen. Jason Plummer [R] |
Sen. Doris Turner [D] | Sen. Dale Fowler [R] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-01-05 | Senate | To Appropriations- Revenue and Finance |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Re-assigned to Appropriations |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2021-03-03 | Senate | To Appropriations- Revenue and Finance |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 20 | 50-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=589&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0589.htm |