IL SB0587 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0213
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0213
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Hotel Operators' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that organizations that (i) are tax exempt under Section 501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code and (ii) rent, lease, or let rooms in a hotel located on property that is exempt from taxation under the Property Tax Code are exempt from the provisions of the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
HOTEL TAX-EXEMPT PROPERTY
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Bivins [R] | Rep. Peter Breen [R] | Rep. Litesa Wallace [D] | Sen. Brian Stewart [R] |
Rep. David Harris [R] | Rep. Keith Wheeler [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0213 |
2017-08-18 | Senate | Effective Date August 18, 2017 |
2017-08-18 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-05-24 | House | Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee; |
2017-05-24 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-11 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2017-05-03 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2017-04-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 008-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins |