IL SB0585 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that each tax purchaser shall pay to the county collector an automation fee set by the county collector of not more than $10 for each item purchased (currently, each county collector may assess such a fee). Provides that the indemnity fee in counties with less than 3,000,000 inhabitants shall be not more than $20 (currently, the fee is $20). Makes changes concerning the fee imposed by the county board on each person purchasing property at a sale under the Code for payment of interest and costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-TAX PURCHASERS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 054-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-002
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-05-30HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-04-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass Revenue; 006-000-000
2018-02-14SenateRe-assigned to Revenue
2017-05-05SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-02-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-02-22SenateTo Subcommittee on Property Taxes
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-01-24SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520021-245Amended CodeCitation Text
3520021-295Amended CodeCitation Text
3520021-330Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback