IL SB0584 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0212
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Provides that in a contested case, the notice required to be provided to all parties may be served by electronic mail if agreed to by the parties. Requires every final order to contain a list of all parties of record to the case including the name and address of the agency or officer entering the order and the addresses of each party as known to the agency where the parties may be served with pleadings, notices, or service of process for any review or further proceedings. Requires every final order to state whether the rules of the agency require any motion or request for reconsideration to make the decision reviewable under the Administrative Review Law and to cite the rule for the requirement. Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that the scope of an Article concerning administrative review shall be liberally construed in the interests of justice to grant an orderly method of judicial review of administrative agency decisions. Provides that no action for administrative review shall be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction under certain specified circumstances. Provides that the circuit court has the power to correct misnomers, which shall include any erroneous identification of the administrative agency. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ADMIN REVIEW-NOTICE; PARTIES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-18SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0212
2017-08-18SenateEffective Date August 18, 2017
2017-08-18SenateGovernor Approved
2017-06-23SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-26SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000
2017-05-24HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2017-05-24HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-16HouseTo Civil Procedure Subcommittee
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-05-03HouseArrived in House
2017-05-02SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Barickman
2017-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Barickman
2017-05-02SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-01SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2017-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 012-000-000
2017-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2017
2017-03-14SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-03-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2017-02-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 15, 2017
2017-02-09SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
2017-01-24SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
510010-25Amended CodeCitation Text
510010-50Amended CodeCitation Text
73553-102Amended CodeCitation Text
73553-107Amended CodeCitation Text
73553-111Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback