IL SB0582 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-22 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Counties Code. Provides that the State Department of Public Health is not authorized to adopt or enforce rules that mandate Department-led reviews to establish compliance with the Local Health Protection Grant rules for local health departments that satisfactorily submit the required Local Health Protection Grant quarterly indicator data for the programs funded by that grant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCAL HEALTH DEPTS-GRANT RULES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-22SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-03-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Public Health
2017-02-16SenatePostponed - Public Health
2017-01-24SenateAssigned to Public Health
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5555-25002Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback