IL SB0581 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0291
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0291
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Voluntary Payroll Deductions Act of 1983. Requires the Comptroller (rather than the Governor) to perform specified duties concerning the designation of organizations qualified to receive payroll deductions and the creation of an Advisory Committee under the Act. Amends the State Comptroller Act. Removes a provision requiring the Department of Central Management Services to transmit to the Comptroller a certified copy of all reports it may issue concerning State property. Provides for Comptroller recess appointments. Amends the State Finance Act. Makes changes concerning fiscal year limitations. Repeals provisions concerning contracts signed by State agencies with procurement authority. Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Makes changes concerning the filing of contracts with the Comptroller. Amends the State Prompt Payment Act. Requires specified information under the Vendor Payment Program to be disclosed on August 1 of each year (currently, July 1 of each year) for the previous fiscal year. Amends the Property Tax Code. Requires the State Comptroller to make available on the Comptroller's website a Fiscal Responsibility Report Card (currently, submit to the General Assembly and the clerk of each county a Fiscal Responsibility Report Card). Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
ST COMPTROLLER REQ & CHANGES
Sponsors
Sen. John Connor [D] | Sen. Scott Bennett [D] | Sen. Michael Halpin [D] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] |
Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Lamont Robinson [D] | Rep. Dan Brady [R] | Rep. Christopher Davidsmeyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-06 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0291 |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Effective Date August 6, 2021 |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John Connor |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John Connor |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3 - May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3 |
2021-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2021-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2021-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 013-000-000 |
2021-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2021-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin |
2021-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-05-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-20 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-001-000 |
2021-05-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-05-13 | House | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2021-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin |
2021-05-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 14, 2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended State Government; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John Connor |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John Connor |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 405 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 11.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 500 | 20-80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 540 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 30-31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 340 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 340 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 340 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |