IL SB0581 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Economic Development Area Tax Increment Allocation Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DUI PREVENTION/EDUCATION FUND

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-03HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-29HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-29HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-004-000
2016-11-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2016-11-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2016-11-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2016-11-22HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2016-05-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2016-05-10HouseFirst Reading
2016-05-06HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2016-05-06HouseArrived in House
2016-05-05SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2016-05-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2016-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sandoval
2016-05-05SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2016-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 016-000-000
2016-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2016-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2016-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2016-05-03SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2016-04-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016
2016-04-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 14, 2016
2016-04-13SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2015-04-21SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2015-04-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015
2015-04-15SenateSecond Reading
2015-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015
2015-03-26SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2015-03-18SenateAssigned to Executive
2015-01-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2015-01-28SenateFirst Reading
2015-01-28SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
206201Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback