IL SB0580 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Natural Resources Restoration Trust Fund Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
STATE FINANCE-FUNDS-TRANSFER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-03 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-12-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2016-11-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2016-11-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2016-11-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2016-11-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-11-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-11-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-11-28 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2016-06-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016 |
2016-05-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-25 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 |
2016-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2016-05-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-05-16 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2016-05-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-10 | House | First Reading |
2016-05-06 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-05-06 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-003-000 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hutchinson |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Appropriations I; 012-000-001 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations I |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Asignments |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 14, 2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 882 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |