IL SB0577 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Child Support Payment Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CIVIL LAW-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-05-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-18SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-16SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2017-04-25SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
750271Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback