IL SB0577 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Employment Security Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
EPA-WATER QUALITY STD VARIANCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-17 | House | First Reading |
2016-05-17 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2016-05-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Cunningham |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 010-000-000 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 14, 2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015 |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1005 | 1005-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |