IL SB0576 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Non-Support Punishment Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the Act's short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HUMAN RIGHTS-STAFFS-OFFICIALS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-03-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-03-01HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-02-28HouseArrived in House
2018-02-28SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-02-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2018-02-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2018
2018-02-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bush
2018-02-22SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-02-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-02-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-02-21SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-02-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-02-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 7, 2018
2018-02-06SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-04-25SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
750161Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback