IL SB0575 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal and Traffic Assessment Act. Provides that the county treasurer or the treasurer of the unit of local government shall (rather than may) create the following funds, if not already in existence: the Court Automation Fund; the Document Storage Fund; the Circuit Clerk Operations and Administration Fund; the State's Attorney Records Automation Fund; the Public Defender Records Automation Fund; the Circuit Court Clerk Electronic Citation Fund; and, in each county where a Children's Advocacy Center provides services, the Child Advocacy Center Fund.
Title
CRIMINAL & TRAFFIC-FUNDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 135 | 10-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=575&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0575.htm |