IL SB0575 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Baseball Facility Liability Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning limitations on liability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CIVIL LAW-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-07-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-15SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-11SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-08SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-04-24SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-02-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 7, 2018
2018-02-06SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-04-25SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7453810Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback