IL SB0573 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0154
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0154
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Defines "uniform invoice". Authorizes the Secretary of State to use commercially available title history services. Makes changes concerning odometer disclosure requirements. Provides that the Secretary is authorized to issue a certificate of title in the name of the dealership if the surrendered certificate of title has no additional space to assign the certificate of title. Makes changes concerning requirements for a licensed seller who sells, transfers, or wholesales a vehicle out of State. Provides that a good faith purchaser of a vehicle for value takes free of any undisclosed liens unless the purchaser has notice of such liens. Provides that the Secretary may remove a franchise affiliate's lien. Provides that a registration permit for 90 (instead of 30) days may be provided for a fee of $13. Makes electric motorcycles subject to additional fees for electric vehicles and allows vanity and personalized plates to be issued to owners of electric vehicles. Provides that certain military plates may be (i) transferred, upon death of the owner, to the surviving spouse; and (ii) reclassified without a replacement fee. In the Chapter concerning the licensing of vehicle dealers, makes changes to the definition of "established place of business". Provides that applicants for certain licenses shall disclose specified information related to persons liable for the performance of the dealership. Prohibits a licensee with a surrendered or revoked license from being named on an application for a subsequent license and from working for another licensee in a recordkeeping, management, or financial position. Prohibits a licensee from permitting an individual who is not an agent of the licensee to purchase a vehicle at an auction.
Title
VEH CD-SOS-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0154 |
2021-07-23 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-07-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-18 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Dan Brady |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 011-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Villivalam |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 018-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 1-213.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-100.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-104.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-112.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-113 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-202 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-209 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-403 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-405.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-506 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-802 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-805 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-806.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-806.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-101.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-101.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-102.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-505 | New Code | See Bill Text |