IL SB0569 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Makes a technical change in the short title Section.
Title
MOBILE HOME LANDLORD TENANT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-16 | House | Remains in Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-05-16 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Judiciary - Civil Committee; 005-005-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2018-05-16 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 002-001-000 |
2018-05-09 | House | To Real & Personal Property Law Subcommittee |
2018-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-03-07 | House | To Real & Personal Property Law Subcommittee |
2018-03-07 | House | Remains in Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-02-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-06-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017 |
2017-05-31 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2017-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2017-05-30 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 065-051-000 |
2017-05-30 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Civil Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-05-30 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Mark Batinick |
2017-05-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-05-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-29 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-29 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-05-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 032-018-000 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed May 17, 2017 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Bush |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bush |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-004-000 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 1-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |