IL SB0564 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. In the provisions relating to holidays, adds January 17 (the birthday of Muhammad Ali) to the list of commemorative holidays. In the provisions relating to courses of study, provides that the teaching of history of the United States shall include the study of the contributions made by Muslims and Muslim Americans to society.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-HOLIDAY-MUHAMMAD ALI

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2021-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2021-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 049-003-000
2021-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Education; 010-002-000
2021-05-30SenateChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura Ellman
2021-05-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2021-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor
2021-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Education
2021-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes
2021-05-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Linda Holmes
2021-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2021
2021-05-27SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2021-05-27HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 113-003-000
2021-05-26HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
2021-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2021-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2021-05-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-12HouseDo Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000
2021-05-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
2021-05-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2021-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
2021-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2021-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2021-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2021-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2021-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2021-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2021-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2021-05-03HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
2021-04-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-04-28HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2021-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2021-04-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-23HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
2021-04-22HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2021-04-22HouseArrived in House
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2021-04-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 046-003-000
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021
2021-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021
2021-03-24SenateDo Pass Education; 011-003-000
2021-03-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
2021-03-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2021-03-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2021-03-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2021-03-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor
2021-03-03SenateAssigned to Education
2021-03-02SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2021-02-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-23SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-23SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105524-2Amended CodeCitation Text
105527-21Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback