IL SB0564 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the County Jail Good Behavior Allowance Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIMINAL LAW-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-27HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-04-23SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
2017-04-25SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7301301Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback