IL SB0564 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0699
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0699
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the County Jail Good Behavior Allowance Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
CRIMINAL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0699 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Effective Date August 3, 2018 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-004-002 |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 130 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |